NY A04958 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-13 - substituted by s2716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-13 - substituted by s2716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending authorization for additional sales tax in the county of Greene until 2013.
Title
Relates to extending authorization for additional sales tax in the county of Greene until 2013.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Lopez [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Assembly | substituted by s2716 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.110 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-02-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02716 (Same As) 2011-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.235