NY A04925 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - advanced to third reading cal.638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - advanced to third reading cal.638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies lawful uses of sealed records.
Title
Clarifies lawful uses of sealed records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.638 |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |