NY A04871 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-29 - print number 4871a
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-29 - print number 4871a
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To provide grants of matching funds for the costs associated with the agricultural production of biodiesel fuel.
Title
Establishes a biodiesel grant program for the agricultural production of biodiesel fuel; defines biodiesel fuel as a renewable, biodegradable, mono alkyl ester combustible liquid fuel derived from jatropha plants, algae production, mustard seed, animal fats and/or waste greases and oils; establishes the biodiesel grant program fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Alessi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | print number 4871a | |
2010-04-29 | amend and recommit to agriculture | |
2010-01-06 | referred to agriculture | |
2009-02-06 | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S07760 (Same As) 2010-05-06 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS