NY A04801 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s4345a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s4345a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes summer camps to hire licensed social workers, physical therapists, psychologists, athletic trainers, mental health care professionals, occupational therapists and other licensed professionals to provide services.
Title
Authorizes summer camps to hire licensed social workers, physical therapists, psychologists, athletic trainers, mental health care professionals, occupational therapists and other licensed professionals to provide services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s4345a |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.181 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 4801a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04345 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - APPROVAL MEMO.13