NY A04790 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-26 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-26 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of the department of transportation in consultation with the department of motor vehicles to develop a program addressing the problem of wrong way drivers on New York interstate highways.
Title
Requires the commissioner of the department of transportation in consultation with the department of motor vehicles to develop a program addressing the problem of wrong way drivers on New York interstate highways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Assembly | held for consideration in transportation |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2011-02-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00938 (Same As) 2012-05-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE