NY A04784 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-24 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-24 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that municipal housing authorities in cities having a population of one million or more shall be subject to the review and regulation of the authorities budget office.
Title
Provides that municipal housing authorities in cities having a population of one million or more shall be subject to the review and regulation of the authorities budget office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05025 (Same As) 2017-03-27 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S05460 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
S05460 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS