NY A04774 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - print number 4774a
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - print number 4774a
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes liability for the death of a person caused by any act of persons permitted to use certain premises and removes liability from the owner, lessee or occupant of premises adjacent to such premises.
Title
Removes liability for the death of a person caused by any act of persons permitted to use certain premises and removes liability from the owner, lessee or occupant of premises adjacent to such premises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Assembly | print number 4774a |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05934 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - PRINT NUMBER 5934A