NY A04769 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-9)
Status: Passed on July 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-15 - signed chap.130
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes certain additional substances as Schedule I stimulant controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes certain additional substances as Schedule I stimulant controlled substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-15Senatesigned chap.130
2011-07-08Assemblydelivered to governor
2011-06-17SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2011-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2011-06-17Senate3RD READING CAL.967
2011-06-17SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3322B
2011-06-17SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2011-06-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2011-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2011-06-15Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.270
2011-06-15Assemblyrules report cal.270
2011-06-15Assemblyreported
2011-06-14Assemblyprint number 4769c
2011-06-14Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to rules
2011-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2011-06-01Assemblyprint number 4769b
2011-06-01Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2011-05-24Assemblyreported referred to codes
2011-02-15Assemblyprint number 4769a
2011-02-15Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to health
2011-02-07Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S03322 (Same As) 2011-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4769C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04769&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04769&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04769A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04769&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04769B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04769&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04769C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04769&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/A4769#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback