NY A04689 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Develops grow your own initiatives at school districts, boards of cooperative educational services and higher education institutions to attract underrepresented candidates into the teaching profession.
Title
Develops grow your own initiatives at school districts, boards of cooperative educational services and higher education institutions to attract underrepresented candidates into the teaching profession.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | print number 4689a |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01100 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - referred to education