NY A04681 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reimburses counties who have purchased or will purchase document management software designed specifically for the child welfare industry.
Title
Reimburses counties who have purchased or will purchase document management software designed specifically for the child welfare industry.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] | Asm. Ron Castorina [R] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] | Asm. Christopher Friend [R] |
Asm. Kenneth Blankenbush [R] | Asm. Joseph Giglio [R] | Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] | Asm. Robert Oaks [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Assembly | held for consideration in children and families |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | reference changed to children and families |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S02121 (Same As) 2018-05-08 - PRINT NUMBER 2121A