NY A04638 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s538b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s538b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires real estate brokers and salespersons to receive implicit bias training as part of their license renewal process.
Title
Requires real estate brokers and salespersons to receive implicit bias training as part of their license renewal process.
Sponsors
Asm. Gina Sillitti [D] | Asm. Mary Walsh [R] | Asm. Jessica Gonzalez-Rojas [D] | Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] |
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s538b |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.315 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.315 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | print number 4638a |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00538 (Same As) 2021-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.73