NY A04616 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a nursing home patient, or his or her representative, to install, operate and maintain, at his or her own expense, an electronic monitoring device in his or her room.
Title
Allows a nursing home patient, or his or her representative, to install, operate and maintain, at his or her own expense, an electronic monitoring device in his or her room.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | referred to health |