NY A04575 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - ordered to third reading rules cal.399
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - ordered to third reading rules cal.399
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the applicability of open meetings and freedom of information laws to certain not-for-profit corporations.
Title
Relates to the applicability of open meetings and freedom of information laws to certain not-for-profit corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.399 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.399 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | print number 4575b |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | print number 4575a |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04339 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - referred to ways and means