NY A04534 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - held for consideration in economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - held for consideration in economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a license to sell liquor at retail for consumption on certain premises.
Title
Relates to a license to sell liquor at retail for consumption on certain premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Assembly | held for consideration in economic development |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S08484 (Same As) 2020-06-09 - referred to economic development