NY A04507 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms the definition of an inmate with a serious mental illness to the definition of "person with a serious mental illness" in the mental hygiene law.
Title
Conforms the definition of an inmate with a serious mental illness to the definition of "person with a serious mental illness" in the mental hygiene law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.170 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.409 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S02690 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION