NY A04458 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes standards for the prompt investigation and settlement of claims arising out of states of emergency and disasters.
Title
Establishes standards for the prompt investigation and settlement of claims arising out of states of emergency and disasters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2016-03-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.417 |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | committed to insurance |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.180 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.103 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.103 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S01398 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE