NY A04420 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - print number 4420a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - print number 4420a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a biotechnology research and development investment tax credit; provides that such credit shall be the product of fifteen percent and the qualified Bio/Med research and development costs paid or incurred in the state; allows credit for the taxable year in which the qualified Bio/Med research and development activity occurs.
Title
Creates a biotechnology research and development investment tax credit; provides that such credit shall be the product of fifteen percent and the qualified Bio/Med research and development costs paid or incurred in the state; allows credit for the taxable year in which the qualified Bio/Med research and development activity occurs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Assembly | print number 4420a |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03237 (Same As) 2018-02-09 - PRINT NUMBER 3237A