NY A04384 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - substituted by s30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - substituted by s30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the empire state development corporation to develop a public awareness campaign promoting personal protective clothing and equipment manufacturing businesses located in New York state.
Title
Authorizes the empire state development corporation to develop a public awareness campaign promoting personal protective clothing and equipment manufacturing businesses located in New York state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Assembly | substituted by s30 |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.359 |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S00030 (Same As) 2021-11-03 - VETOED MEMO.53