NY A04365 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-14 - signed chap.370
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-14 - signed chap.370
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits pay-per-call prize schemes from charging more for the call than that charged by a telephone corporation regulated by the appropriate regulatory commission for the same call.
Title
Prohibits pay-per-call prize schemes from charging more for the call than that charged by a telephone corporation regulated by the appropriate regulatory commission for the same call.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-14 | Senate | signed chap.370 |
2012-08-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1319 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7595A |
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-21 | Senate | returned to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4365a |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-18 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2012-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2012-05-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.506 |
2012-05-01 | Assembly | reported |
2012-04-18 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2011-02-03 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S07595 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4365A