NY A04313 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-36)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides up to three years of service credit to members of public retirement systems of the state for military service rendered during times of peace; removes requirement that such military service occur during specified periods of hostilities; requires such members have at least five years of credited service, not including military service.
Title
Provides up to three years of service credit to members of public retirement systems of the state for military service rendered during times of peace; removes requirement that such military service occur during specified periods of hostilities; requires such members have at least five years of credited service, not including military service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | print number 4313a |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2015-01-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |