NY A04292 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-24 - print number 4292a
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-24 - print number 4292a
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a juvenile justice smart investment program.
Title
Creates a juvenile justice smart investment program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-24 | Assembly | print number 4292a |
2012-01-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2011-02-02 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S00065 (Same As) 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES