NY A04285 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - signed chap.340
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - signed chap.340
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to establish a resident curator program for the rehabilitation of state park buildings.
Title
Authorizes the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to establish a resident curator program for the rehabilitation of state park buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-27 | Assembly | signed chap.340 |
2024-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-03-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.389 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S722 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.308 |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S00722 (Same As) 2024-03-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4285