NY A04215 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - substituted by s2787
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - substituted by s2787
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the county of Erie to market serial bonds at private sale through June 30, 2012.
Title
Permits the county of Erie to market serial bonds at private sale through June 30, 2012.
Sponsors
Asm. Robin Schimminger [D] | Asm. Sam Hoyt [D] | Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Mark Schroeder [D] |
Asm. Dennis Gabryszak [D] | Asm. James Hayes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Assembly | substituted by s2787 |
2011-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.384 |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2011-04-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-02-02 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S02787 (Same As) 2011-06-08 - SIGNED CHAP.63