NY A04150 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that advertisements which include a discount or rebate in the advertised price also include the actual selling price prior to any deductions in the same font and size.
Title
Requires that advertisements which include a discount or rebate in the advertised price also include the actual selling price prior to any deductions in the same font and size.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |