NY A04124 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the micro business outreach center assistance program within the department of economic development, and provides for its functions, powers and duties; further creates the micro business outreach center network; establishes a reporting requirement by the commissioner of economic development.
Title
Creates the micro business outreach center assistance program within the department of economic development, and provides for its functions, powers and duties; further creates the micro business outreach center network; establishes a reporting requirement by the commissioner of economic development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to small business |
2017-02-01 | Assembly | referred to small business |
Same As/Similar To
S08551 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES