NY A04109 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-20 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-20 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides supports and services for youth suffering from adverse childhood experiences.
Title
Provides supports and services for youth suffering from adverse childhood experiences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S04692 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE