NY A04088 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-18 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-18 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize veterans who have served in combat during Operation Iraqi Freedom after March 20, 2003 to receive extra credit on competitive examinations.
Title
An act to amend the civil service law, in relation to extra credit for certain veterans on competitive examinations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | held for consideration in governmental employees | |
2010-01-06 | referred to governmental employees | |
2009-01-30 | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S02770 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
A06302 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - referred to governmental employees
A06302 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - referred to governmental employees