NY A04071 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to increasing membership on the public health and health planning council and directing the appointment of members representing particular areas of concern.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to increasing membership on the public health and health planning council and directing the appointment of members representing particular areas of concern.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-18Senate3RD READING CAL.290
2019-03-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S870
2019-03-05SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2019-03-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-05Assemblypassed assembly
2019-02-28Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.81
2019-02-28Assemblyreported
2019-02-01Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S00870 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4071

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback