NY A04047 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - ordered to third reading rules cal.270
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - ordered to third reading rules cal.270
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires cash lanes be made available at certain toll barriers.
Title
Requires cash lanes be made available at certain toll barriers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.270 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.270 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S03092 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION