NY A04042 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that in judicial proceedings to review real property assessments in cities of one million or more inhabitants, the assessing method, capitalization rate, and other data or formula used to determine valuation must be disclosed to the petitioner.
Title
Provides that in judicial proceedings to review real property assessments in cities of one million or more inhabitants, the assessing method, capitalization rate, and other data or formula used to determine valuation must be disclosed to the petitioner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04038 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT