NY A04008 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the judicial diversion program for alcohol and substance abuse offenders; requires court to consider, review and document evidence relating to a defendant's propensity for violent conduct prior to ordering such defendant into a judicial diversion program; establishes the crime of unauthorized departure from a rehabilitation facility.
Title
Relates to the judicial diversion program for alcohol and substance abuse offenders; requires court to consider, review and document evidence relating to a defendant's propensity for violent conduct prior to ordering such defendant into a judicial diversion program; establishes the crime of unauthorized departure from a rehabilitation facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-01-28 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01901 (Same As) 2016-05-25 - referred to codes