NY A04002 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - approval memo.44
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the appointment of members of the battery park city authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appointment of members of the battery park city authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-18Senateapproval memo.44
2017-12-18Senatesigned chap.473
2017-12-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.2150
2017-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S130B
2017-06-19SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2017-06-19Senatereturned to senate
2017-06-19Assemblyrepassed assembly
2017-06-14Assemblyamended on third reading 4002a
2017-06-14Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2017-06-14AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-14Senaterecalled from senate
2017-05-02SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2017-05-02Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-02Assemblypassed assembly
2017-04-27Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.206
2017-04-25Assemblyreported
2017-01-30Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S00130 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4002A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04002&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04002&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04002
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04002&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04002A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04002&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04002&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A4002#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback