NY A03989 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - held for consideration in racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - held for consideration in racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the premises on which games of chance may be conducted.
Title
Relates to the premises on which games of chance may be conducted.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Assembly | held for consideration in racing and wagering |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2013-01-30 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S01192 (Same As) 2014-03-11 - referred to racing and wagering