NY A03987 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the right of the people to bear and keep arms.
Title
Relates to the right of the people to bear and keep arms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2023-03-01 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |