NY A03959 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands requirements for regulatory impact statements to include discussion of potential benefits and cost savings; creates New York state regulatory review council to review every promulgation, repeal or amendment of every rule or regulation; provides that no new rule, unless critical to health, safety, or welfare, may become effective without the approval of the council; provides for the procedures of the council; provides for an annual report by the council on its actions.
Title
Expands requirements for regulatory impact statements to include discussion of potential benefits and cost savings; creates New York state regulatory review council to review every promulgation, repeal or amendment of every rule or regulation; provides that no new rule, unless critical to health, safety, or welfare, may become effective without the approval of the council; provides for the procedures of the council; provides for an annual report by the council on its actions.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Butler [R] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] | Asm. Joseph Errigo [R] | Asm. Mary Walsh [R] |
Asm. William Barclay [R] | Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2018-02-07 | Assembly | print number 3959a |
2018-02-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04272 (Same As) 2018-02-02 - PRINT NUMBER 4272A