NY A03949 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - ordered to third reading cal.165
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - ordered to third reading cal.165
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits police officers from using racial and ethnic profiling; requires that a procedure be established for the taking and review of complaints against police officers for racial and ethnic profiling; allows an action for injunctive relief and/or damages to be brought against a law enforcement agency, any agent of a law enforcement agency and the supervisor of an agent.
Title
Prohibits police officers from using racial and ethnic profiling; requires that a procedure be established for the taking and review of complaints against police officers for racial and ethnic profiling; allows an action for injunctive relief and/or damages to be brought against a law enforcement agency, any agent of a law enforcement agency and the supervisor of an agent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.165 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.81 |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-28 | Assembly | referred to codes |