NY A03923 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires counties to maintain a confidential registry of people of all ages with disabilities for the purpose of evacuating and sheltering such persons during disasters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires counties to maintain a confidential registry of people of all ages with disabilities for the purpose of evacuating and sheltering such persons during disasters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2019-05-29Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-29Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.405
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-04-09Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-03-19Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-31Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S05750 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03923&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03923&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03923
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03923&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03923&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03923&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03923&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback