NY A03904 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.190
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.190
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to renewal of a lease under the stabilization code promulgated by the real estate industry stabilization association; defines demolish.
Title
Relates to renewal of a lease under the stabilization code promulgated by the real estate industry stabilization association; defines demolish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.190 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-03-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.73 |
2013-02-27 | Assembly | reported |
2013-01-29 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S03176 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT