NY A03878 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-25 - print number 3878a
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-25 - print number 3878a
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount combat veterans shall be exempt from real property taxation to thirty-five percent.
Title
Increases the amount combat veterans shall be exempt from real property taxation to thirty-five percent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Assembly | print number 3878a |
2014-02-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2013-01-29 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S02473 (Same As) 2014-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 2473A