NY A03873 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - advanced to third reading cal.864
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - advanced to third reading cal.864
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to school climate and codes of conduct on school property and disciplinary action following violation of such codes of conduct; and makes conforming amendments.
Title
Relates to school climate and codes of conduct on school property and disciplinary action following violation of such codes of conduct; and makes conforming amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.864 |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | print number 3873a |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S03036 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION