NY A03827 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - substituted by s5905
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - substituted by s5905
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits naming dependent children under the age of 18 living in the same household with a parent or guardian in petitions to recover possession of real property and eviction warrants; seals any records pertaining to dependent children under the age of 18 living in the same household with a parent or guardian who were residing on or removed from such property.
Title
Prohibits naming dependent children under the age of 18 living in the same household with a parent or guardian in petitions to recover possession of real property and eviction warrants; seals any records pertaining to dependent children under the age of 18 living in the same household with a parent or guardian who were residing on or removed from such property.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Zohran Kwame Mamdani [D] | Asm. Sarahana Shrestha [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
Asm. Steven Raga [D] | Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s5905 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.754 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.754 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05905 (Same As) 2024-05-20 - referred to judiciary