NY A03669 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the modernization of affordable housing financing authorities.
Title
Relates to the modernization of affordable housing financing authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-28 | Assembly | print number 3669a |
2022-05-28 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S02731 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT