NY A03593 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.237
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.237
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Hempstead in the county of Nassau to establish residential parking systems in the neighborhoods of Bellerose Terrace and Elmont.
Title
Authorizes the town of Hempstead in the county of Nassau to establish residential parking systems in the neighborhoods of Bellerose Terrace and Elmont.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.237 |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-09 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-05-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.241 |
2022-05-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7554C |
2022-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.527 |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | print number 3593e |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | print number 3593d |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-12-03 | Assembly | print number 3593c |
2021-12-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | print number 3593b |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | print number 3593a |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07554 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3593E