NY A03574 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants a full real property tax exemption for a severely injured soldier of the armed forces of the United States.
Title
Grants a full real property tax exemption for a severely injured soldier of the armed forces of the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | print number 3574a |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2015-01-27 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S02253 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS