NY A03430 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires adult protective services to consult with the local area agency on aging when the individual requiring services is sixty years of age or older.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires adult protective services to consult with the local area agency on aging when the individual requiring services is sixty years of age or older.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-29Senatetabled
2014-12-29Senatevetoed memo.570
2014-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2014-06-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-12Senate3RD READING CAL.1335
2014-06-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5711
2014-04-28SenateREFERRED TO AGING
2014-04-28Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-04-28Assemblypassed assembly
2014-04-24Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.558
2014-04-08Assemblyreported
2014-01-13Assemblycommitted to aging
2014-01-08Assemblyordered to third reading cal.169
2014-01-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-01-08SenateDIED IN SENATE
2013-05-30SenateREFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
2013-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2013-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2013-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.394
2013-05-21Assemblyreported
2013-01-25Assemblyreferred to aging

Same As/Similar To

S05711 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3430

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback