NY A03423 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - print number 3423a
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - print number 3423a
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies conciliation procedures in cases when the recipient of public assistance programs refuses to comply with employment program requirements.
Title
Clarifies conciliation procedures in cases when the recipient of public assistance programs refuses to comply with employment program requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Assembly | print number 3423a |
2012-03-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to social services |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2011-01-25 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S06910 (Same As) 2012-04-11 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES