NY A03420 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-21 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-21 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs New York city housing authority to first offer vacant apartments to mobility impaired tenants living on a higher floor.
Title
Directs New York city housing authority to first offer vacant apartments to mobility impaired tenants living on a higher floor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.134 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.317 |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2011-05-04 | Assembly | print number 3420a |
2011-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2011-01-25 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S04455 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT