NY A03403 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the staff sergeant Alex R. Jimenez New York state military immigrant family legacy program within the department of veterans' services.
Title
Establishes the staff sergeant Alex R. Jimenez New York state military immigrant family legacy program within the department of veterans' services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Assembly | tabled |
2023-11-17 | Assembly | vetoed memo.44 |
2023-11-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1087 |
2023-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3586A |
2023-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.439 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.439 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | print number 3403a |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2023-02-03 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S03586 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3403A