NY A03343 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to violations of the uniform fire prevention and building code.
Title
Relates to violations of the uniform fire prevention and building code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.39 |
2020-12-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.333 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-22 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.224 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | substituted for a3343 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.387 |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted by s1714 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.224 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01714 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.39