NY A03335 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - advanced to third reading cal.691
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - advanced to third reading cal.691
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to personnel records of police officers, firefighters and correction officers.
Title
Relates to personnel records of police officers, firefighters and correction officers.
Sponsors
Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Dan Quart [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.691 |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02850 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES